EP0905856 - EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING ELECTRIC POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Tamiji, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
TAKEI, Toshitaka, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Kuniharu, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98901104.4 | 03.02.1998 | [1999/13] | WO1998JP00441 | Priority number, date | JP19970020739 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2073997 | [1999/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834319 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905856 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02J17/00, H02J5/00, H02M3/335, H02J7/02 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US);
H02J50/70 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/13] | H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | [1999/13] | English: | EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING ELECTRIC POWER | [1999/13] | French: | EQUIPEMENT ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1998 | Translation filed | 10.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 25.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4831507 (COLLEY III WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [A]EP0580107 (DAIFUKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 11, line 26 - column 13, line 54 *; | [A]EP0653831 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]US4001665 (WISNER DANIEL A, et al); | [A]US4331225 (BOLGER JOHN G); | [A]EP0200321 (HOCHMAIR INGEBORG [AT], et al); | [A]US4654880 (SONTAG HUGH D [US]); | [A]US4679560 (GALBRAITH DOUGLAS C [US]); | [A]US4802080 (BOSSI BURT J [US], et al); | [A]EP0473957 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al); | [A]US5428521 (KIGAWA MICHIO [JP], et al); | [T]GB2307379 (SONY CORP [JP]) |