EP0986399 - CHELATING IMMUNOSTIMULATING COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Limited 45 Poplar Road Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states CSL LIMITED 45 Poplar Road Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACFARLAN, Roderick, Ian 285 Union Road Balwyn, VIC 3103 / AU | 02 /
MALLIAROS, Jim 38 Rosanna Street Carnegie, VIC 3163 / AU | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., Gray's Inn, 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Marshall, Monica Anne J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98901888.2 | 13.02.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998AU00080 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO05178 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: AU PO517897 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836772 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986399 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986399 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | IMMUNSTIMULIERENDE CHELATKOMPLEXE | [2000/12] | English: | CHELATING IMMUNOSTIMULATING COMPLEXES | [2000/12] | French: | COMPLEXES IMMUNOSTIMULANTS CHELATEURS | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | LU | 13.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/08] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9206710 (NEDERLANDEN STAAT [NL]) [Y] 1-18* page 28 - page 29 *; | [Y]WO9609805 (ZONAGEN INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 36 - page 43 * | International search | [A]EP0180564 (MOREIN BROR); | [A]WO8702250 (MOREIN BROR); | [A]WO9305789 (CAMBRIDGE BIOTECH CORP [US]); | [A]WO9633739 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) | [A] - BARR I.G. et al., "ISCOMS (Immunostimulating Complexes): The First Decade", IMMUNOLOGY AND CELL BIOLOGY, Vol. 74, (1996), pp. 8-25. | Examination | - SHNEK ET AL, LANGMUIR, (1994), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 2382 - 2388 |