EP0952896 - MACHINE FOR BENDING TUBES WITH SMALL DIAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBOLIX Rue Bourbon F-32430 Cologne / FR | [1999/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAUBERT, Philippe Rue Bourbon 32430 Cologne / FR | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 98902049.0 | 09.01.1998 | [1999/44] | WO1998FR00033 | Priority number, date | FR19970000437 | 14.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9700437 | [1999/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831484 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952896 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952896 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/02, B21D11/06 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
B21D11/06 (EP,US);
B21D7/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BIEGEN VON ROHREN MIT KLEINEN DURCHMESSER | [1999/44] | English: | MACHINE FOR BENDING TUBES WITH SMALL DIAMETER | [1999/44] | French: | MACHINE A CINTRER DES TUBES DE FAIBLE DIAMETRE | [1999/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.05.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2002/16] | GB | 16.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0538207 (MACCHINE CURVATUBI CRIPPA AGOS [IT]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0319400 (SNECMA [FR]); | [A]US1567107 (HUGO BONN CARL ROBERT) |