EP0925660 - IMPROVED CHANNEL SPACING FOR DISTORTION REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellularvision Technology & Telecommunications, L. P. Dag Hammarskjold Boulevard Freehold, NJ 07728 / US | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSARD, Bernard Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Lenzing, Andreas, et al Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09 40103 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Lenzing, Andreas, Dr., et al Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98902145.6 | 19.02.1998 | [1999/26] | WO1998IB00213 | Priority number, date | US19970819896 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: US 819896 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9842092 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925660 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J1/12 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
H04L5/06 (EP,US);
H04J1/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/26] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER KANALABSTAND ZUR VERZERRUNGSVERMINDERUNG | [1999/26] | English: | IMPROVED CHANNEL SPACING FOR DISTORTION REDUCTION | [1999/26] | French: | ESPACEMENT DE CANAL AMELIORE POUR LA REDUCTION DE DISTORSION | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/52] | 31.07.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4747160 (BOSSARD BERNARD [US]); | [X]WO8807800 (INDEP BROADCASTING AUTHORITY [GB]); | [AP]US5719641 (MIZOGUCHI SHOICHI [JP]) |