EP1016179 - SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGGREN, Bertil Rönnbergagatan 2 B 72346 Västerås / SE | 02 /
GERTMAR, Lars Humlegatan 6 72226 Västerås / SE | 03 /
NYGREN, Jan-Anders Karlfeldtsgatan 27 B 72222 Västerås / SE | 04 /
PETERSSON, Tore Skördegatan 6 72466 Västerås / SE | 05 /
LEIJON, Mats Hyvlargatan 5 72335 Västerås / SE | [2010/41] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
BERGGREN, Bertil Rönnbergagatan 2 B S-723 46 Väster s / SE | ||
02 /
GERTMAR, Lars Humlegatan 6 S-722 26 Väster s / SE | |||
03 /
NYGREN, Jan-Anders Karlfeldtsgatan 27 B S-722 22 Väster s / SE | |||
04 /
PETERSSON, Tore Skördegatan 6 S-724 66 Väster s / SE | |||
05 /
LEIJON, Mats Hyvlargatan 5 S-723 35 Väster s / SE | Representative(s) | Hopfgarten, Nils, et al Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Hopfgarten, Nils, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98902371.8 | 02.02.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998SE00174 | Priority number, date | SE19970000367 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: SE 9700367 | SE19970004431 | 28.11.1997 Original published format: SE 9704431 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834312 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016179 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/06 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H02P9/305 (EP,US);
H02H7/06 (EP,US);
Y10S174/19 (EP,US);
Y10S174/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Extension states | LT | 03.09.1999 | LV | 03.09.1999 | RO | 03.09.1999 | SI | 03.09.1999 | Title | German: | SYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2000/27] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2000/27] | French: | MACHINE SYNCHRONE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5321308 (JOHNCOCK ALLAN W [US]); | [A]US5264778 (KIMMEL DONALD S [US], et al); | [A]US4245182 (AOTSU HIROAKI, et al) | by applicant | US5321308 |