EP0927471 - HYBRID CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 Postfach 8047 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÜEGSEGGER, Stefan Am Börtli 17 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Siemens AG, Patentabteilung, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98902928.5 | 26.02.1998 | [1999/27] | WO1998CH00077 | Priority number, date | CH19970000714 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: CH 71497 | CH19970000756 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: CH 75697 | [1999/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843385 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927471 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04B1/58 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/1423 (EP);
H04B1/58 (EP);
H04B3/03 (EP);
H04B1/581 (EP);
H04B1/583 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/27] | Title | German: | GABELSCHALTUNG | [1999/27] | English: | HYBRID CIRCUIT | [1999/27] | French: | CIRCUIT HYBRIDE | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 13.08.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6042959 ; | [A]FR2677196 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850713), vol. 9, no. 169, Database accession no. (E - 328), & JP60042959 A 19850307 (FUJI FUAKOMU SEIGIYO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - CHERRY, "A self-balancing hybrid network", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE., NEW YORK US, (197009), vol. 58, no. 9, pages 1393 - 1394, XP002048654 [A] 1 * abstract * |