EP0888471 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING COMPOSITE SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Vetrotex France S.A. 130, avenue des Follaz 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states VETROTEX FRANCE 130, avenue des Follaz 73000 Chambéry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUBINOUX, Dominique Rue du Sabot F-38660 La Terrasse / FR | 02 /
VOIRON, Jacques Côte Barrier F-73160 Saint-Jean de Couz / FR | 03 /
DEBALME, Jean-Paul 10, boulevard Lemenc F-73000 Chambéry / FR | 04 /
SAINT-JOHN, Charles 61, rue de Fontvieille F-73290 La Motte Servolex / FR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 98903064.8 | 14.01.1998 | [1999/01] | WO1998FR00067 | Priority number, date | FR19970000387 | 16.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9700387 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831857 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888471 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888471 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/54, D04H13/00, D04H5/06 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
D04H3/153 (EP,US);
B32B37/04 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/004 (EP,US);
D04H3/011 (EP,US);
D04H5/06 (EP,US);
B32B2262/02 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0284 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2305/188 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (EP,US);
B32B2309/105 (EP,US);
B32B37/1027 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDPLATTEN | [1999/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING COMPOSITE SHEETS | [1999/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUES COMPOSITES | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2003/50] | NL | 19.03.2003 | |
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 19.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB994336 (DU PONT) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 88 *; | [X]US4722857 (TOMIOKA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 8 - line 58 *; | [X]GB2226054 (RHONE POULENC FIBRES [FR]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 23 * * page 20, line 13 - page 21, line 23 *; | [Y]US5294482 (GESSNER SCOTT L [US]) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 54 *; | [A]EP0616055 (VETROTEX FRANCE SA [FR]) [A] 3* column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]WO9512553 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 * |