EP0909157 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION CONTAINING AS COATING AGENT KERATINOUS FIBRE A FILM-FORMING MIXTURE CONSISTING OF POLYMER PARTICLES CAPABLE OF BEING FILM-FORMED AND PARTICLES NOT CAPABLE OF BEING FILM-FORMED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUGIN, Nathalie 28, rue Merlin F-75011 Paris / FR | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Dodin, Catherine, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Dodin, Catherine, et al L'Oreal-D.P.I., 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98903074.7 | 16.01.1998 | [1999/16] | WO1998FR00080 | Priority number, date | FR19970000545 | 20.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9700545 | [1999/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831329 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909157 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/032 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/87 (KR);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/85 (KR);
A61K8/88 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/16] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHES PRÄPARAT DAS ALS BESCHICHTIGUNGSMITTEL DER KERATINFASERN EIN FILMFORMENDER GEMISCH BESTEHEND AUS FILMBILDENDEN POLYMERTEILCHEN UND NICHT FILMBILDENDE TEILCHEN | [1999/16] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION CONTAINING AS COATING AGENT KERATINOUS FIBRE A FILM-FORMING MIXTURE CONSISTING OF POLYMER PARTICLES CAPABLE OF BEING FILM-FORMED AND PARTICLES NOT CAPABLE OF BEING FILM-FORMED | [1999/16] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE COMPRENANT COMME AGENT DE REVETEMENT DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES UN MELANGE FILMOGENE CONSTITUE DE PARTICULES DE POLYMERE FILMIFIABLES ET DE PARTICULES NON-FILMIFIABLES | [1999/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0764436 (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1-10,13-26 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0288012 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,14-19,22,25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9112793 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,4,12,22-25 * pages 1-3 * * page 5, lines 3-10 * * examples 1-10 *; | [X]GB2238242 (MAYBE HOLDING CO [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,9-12,15,16,23-25 * pages 1-9; tables 1-3 * |