EP0956225 - ELECTRONIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited Stratford Road, Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited Stratford Road, Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited 46 Park Street London W1Y 4DJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Stratford Road Solihull B90 4LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Alan, Leslie 24 Malvern Road Balsall Common Coventry CV7 7DU / GB | 02 /
HOWELL, Mark, Leighton 11 Blakelands Avenue Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 1RJ / GB | 03 /
STEVENS, Simon, David 18 Ellerside Road Billesley Birmingham B13 0DP / GB | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903125.7 | 03.02.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998GB00333 | Priority number, date | GB19970002156 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: GB 9702156 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833689 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956225 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956225 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/58 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B60T8/4072 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/3255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES BREMSSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [1999/46] | English: | ELECTRONIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES | [1999/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ELECTRONIQUE POUR VEHICULES | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5040852 (TAKATA KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]US4950028 (HARRISON ANTHONY W [GB]) [A] 1-13 |