EP1024893 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR ARRAYING BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIOTT, John, Duncan 723 Old Eagle School Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 02 /
GLEASON, John, Gerald 8 Heron Hill Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 03 /
LEBER, Jack, Dale 403 Pine Run Road Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 04 /
SIMOLIKE, Gerald, Craig 616 Felton Avenue Sharon Hill, PA 19079 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ralph Francis, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Walker, Ralph Francis, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903485.5 | 15.01.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US00685 | Priority number, date | US19970785072 | 17.01.1997 Original published format: US 785072 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832000 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024893 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, G01N35/02 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
B01F33/405 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00459 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00468 (EP,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00574 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114998 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SORTIEREN VON KUGELN | [2000/32] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR ARRAYING BEADS | [2000/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR TRIER DES BILLES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9740383 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,5,11 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 14 * * page 9, line 4 - line 6 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 30 * * page 12, line 15 - page 19, line 5 * * figures 1-12B *; | [XAY]WO9428119 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11 * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 12 * * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 2 * * page 18, line 27 - page 19, line 34 * * figures 4A-4F * [A] 4,10 [Y] 3,7,8; | [YA]WO9608338 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,2,5,11; | [Y]US5252296 (ZUCKERMANN RONALD N [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 5, line 37 - line 43 * * column 6, line 29 - line 35 * * figures 2,3A *; | [A]WO9633805 (ONTOGEN CORP [US]) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [A]US5612227 (INOUE TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 9 * column A; figure 10 *; | [A]US5649576 (KIRK GREGORY L [US], et al); | [A]DE4329791 (LICHTENBERG TEJA [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4937048 (SAKAI MASAHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US4913179 (ENGEL WOLF D [DE], et al); | [A]US5185269 (WELLS JOHN R [US]) |