EP0961818 - PRINTABLE LINERLESS LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSS, Timothy, J. 5654 Frontier Avenue Niagara Falls, NY 14304 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903532.4 | 20.01.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US00883 | Priority number, date | US19970795321 | 04.02.1997 Original published format: US 795321 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833859 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961818 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961818 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/04 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP);
C09J7/201 (EP);
C09J7/21 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C09J2203/334 (EP);
C09J2301/302 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | BEDRUCKBARE TRÄGERBANDLOSEN ETIKETTEN | [1999/49] | English: | PRINTABLE LINERLESS LABELS | [1999/49] | French: | ETIQUETTES IMPRIMABLES SANS DOUBLURE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1619254 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [A] 1-20 * page 6, lines 1-7 * * claim - *; | [A]US5496635 (FRANCIS ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-20* claims 1,8-12 * |