EP0981353 - FACILITATION OF REPAIR OF NEURAL INJURY WITH CM101/GBS TOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, TN 37240 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY 305 Kirkland Hall Nashville, TN 37240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLERQVIST, Carl, G. 9014 Carondelet Place Brentwood, TN 37027 / US | 02 /
WAMIL, Artur, W. 7913 Amber Hills Lane Nashville, TN 37221-3229 / US | 03 /
WAMIL, Barbara, D. 7913 Amber Hills Lane Nashville, TN 37221-3229 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98904795.6 | 29.01.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US01851 | Priority number, date | US19970791857 | 29.01.1997 Original published format: US 791857 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832448 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981353 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981353 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715, A61K35/74, A61P25/08 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61K38/164 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | A61K31/715 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER HEILUNGSPROZESS VON NEURALVERLETZUNGEN ANHAND VON CM101/GBS-TOXIN | [2000/09] | English: | FACILITATION OF REPAIR OF NEURAL INJURY WITH CM101/GBS TOXIN | [2000/09] | French: | FACILITATION DE LA REPARATION DES LESIONS NEUROLOGIQUES AVEC CM101/GBS | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 22.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2006/22] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AX]US5010062 (HELLERGVIST CARL G [US]) [A] 1-35 *cf. abstract, claims* [X] 36-49; | [E]WO9814603 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [E] 1-49*cf. abstract, page 10, lines 4-10* |