EP0998553 - PROTEIN TYROSINE KINASE 2(PYK2),NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duong, Le T. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
Rodan, Gideon A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/19] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98905026.5 | 09.02.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US02494 | Priority number, date | US19970037561P | 11.02.1997 Original published format: US 37561 P | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835016 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998553 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/54, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/68 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
C12Q1/48 (EP);
G01N2333/9121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | PROTEIN TYROSINKINASE 2 (PYK2), NUKLEINSÄUREN UND TESTVERFAHREN | [2000/19] | English: | PROTEIN TYROSINE KINASE 2(PYK2),NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND ASSAY | [2000/19] | French: | PROTEINE TYROSINE-KINASE 2 (PYK2), ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET METHODE DE DETECTION | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SASAKI H ET AL, "CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF CELL ADHESION KINASE BETA, A NOVEL PROTEIN-TYROSINE KINASE OF THE FOCAL ADHESION KINASE SUBFAMILY", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19950908), vol. 270, no. 36, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21206 - 21219, XP000606908 [X] 5 * abstract * * page 21216, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.36.21206 | International search | [Y]US5573944 ; | [Y]US5538858 | [X] - AVRAHAM S., ET AL., "IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL RELATED ADHESION FOCAL TYROSINE KINASE (RAFTK) FROM MEGAKARYOCYTES AND BRAIN.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19951117), vol. 270., no. 46., doi:10.1074/jbc.270.46.27742, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27742 - 27751., XP002912212 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.46.27742 |