EP0964845 - PROCESSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/51] | PROCESSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SATURATED DERIVATIVES THEREOF | ||
[2004/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 18898 / US | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 18898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANOGUE, William, H. 224 Beverly Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
RAO, V., N., Mallikarjuna 1 Georgetown Avenue Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | 03 /
SIEVERT, Allen, Capron 215 Rhett Lane Elkton, MD 21921 / US | 04 /
SWEARINGEN, Steven, H. 129 W. 13th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98905114.9 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998US03132 | Priority number, date | US19970038430P | 19.02.1997 Original published format: US 38430 P | US19970049723P | 16.06.1997 Original published format: US 49723 P | US19970056795P | 25.08.1997 Original published format: US 56795 P | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9837043 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964845 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964845 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/00, C07C21/00 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C07C43/12 (EP);
B01J23/868 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP);
C07C17/00 (EP);
C07C17/087 (EP);
C07C17/21 (EP);
C07C17/23 (EP);
C07C17/354 (EP);
C07C17/38 (EP);
C07C19/08 (EP);
B01J27/12 (EP);
B01J27/132 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/00, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/00, C07C21/18 (EP);
C07C17/087, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/21, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/23, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/23, C07C21/18 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUORPROPEN UND 2-CHLOR-PENTAFLUORPROPEN | [2004/01] | English: | PROCESSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE | [2004/01] |
Former [1999/51] | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUORPROPEN UND 2-CHLOR-PENTAFLUORPROPEN, SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, WELCHE GESÄTTIGTE DERIVATEN DAVON ENTHALTEN | ||
Former [1999/51] | PROCESSES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SATURATED DERIVATIVES THEREOF | ||
Former [1999/51] | PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE, 2-CHLORO-PENTAFLUOROPROPENE ET COMPOSITIONS RENFERMANT LEURS DERIVES SATURES | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03078647.9 / EP1428811 | EP10010042.9 / EP2269970 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9719751 (DU PONT ;DUZICK TIMOTHY C (US); RAO VELLIYUR NOTT MALLIKARJUNA (US) [PX] 1-12 * see claims; page 4 - page 5; examples 23,19 *; | [Y]WO9008748 (DU PONT) [Y] 1-12 * see claims; page 4 - page 5; examples 8,9 *; | [Y]US3636173 (GARDNER LLOYD E) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3505417 (GARDNER LLOYD E) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9504022 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC) [X] 13-20 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 6; example 2; claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0442075 (BAYER AG) [X] 13-20 * claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0634384 (HOECHST AG) [X] 21 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 12; claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP0676386 (SOLVAY) [X] 21 * the whole document * |