EP0964728 - BRAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ribarits, Ladislaus Peter Schwedenplatz 4/18 1010 Wien / AT | For all designated states Burian, Bertram Halmgasse 2/8 1020 Wien / AT | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Patentanwalt Dorotheergasse 7 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98905139.6 | 09.03.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998AT00059 | Priority number, date | AT19970000399 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: AT 39997 | AT19980000138 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: AT 13898 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9840133 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964728 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964728 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/14 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A63C17/1427 (EP);
A63C17/06 (EP);
A63C2017/1481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1999/51] | Title | German: | BREMSVORRICHTUNG | [1999/51] | English: | BRAKING DEVICE | [1999/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.08.2003 | IT | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | CH | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | NL | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 20.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB609453 (SONTI VENKATA RAMANIAH) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 37 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0744198 (SFOGGIA NARCISO) [DA] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]US5143387 (COLLA JEFF M) [A] 1,3 * siehe Zusammenfassung;; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4033596 (ANDORSEN JOHN PETER ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 12; figures 1,3 * |