EP0954266 - SELF-ADHESIVE READY-MADE BANDAGE FOR RESTRICTING STRETCHING OR BENDING OF THE METACARPOPHALANGEAL JOINT AND OF THE WRIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIMMELSBACH, Peter Rübker Strasse 16A D-21614 Buxtehude / DE | [1999/45] | Application number, filing date | 98905309.5 | 17.01.1998 | [1999/45] | WO1998EP00251 | Priority number, date | DE1997102301 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702301 | DE1997102302 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702302 | [1999/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832405 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954266 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954266 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/10, A61F5/058, A61F5/01 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
A61F5/05866 (EP,US);
A61F13/104 (EP,US);
A61F5/0118 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBENDE FERTIGBANDAGE ZUR STRECKUNGS- ODER BEUGUNGSEINSCHRÄNKUNG DES FINGERGRUNDGELENKS UND DES HANDGELENKS | [1999/45] | English: | SELF-ADHESIVE READY-MADE BANDAGE FOR RESTRICTING STRETCHING OR BENDING OF THE METACARPOPHALANGEAL JOINT AND OF THE WRIST | [1999/45] | French: | BANDAGE PREFORME AUTO-ADHESIF POUR LIMITER L'EXTENSION OU LA FLEXION DE L'ARTICULATION METACARPOPHALANGIENNE DU DOIGT ET CELLE DU POIGNET | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.03.2003 | Appeal received No. T0734/03 | 27.05.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.10.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 13.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.04.2006 | NL | 26.04.2006 | SE | 26.07.2006 | AT | 17.01.2007 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/15] | IT | 26.04.2006 | |
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 26.04.2006 | |
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 26.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR752041 (LAZORTHES) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE734888 (KONRAD ROMMING DR MED); | [A]US2563689 (FRITZ MUHLHAUSER); | [XY]US2875758 (FUZAK GEORGE T, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,12,13,15,16 * column 2, line 5 - line 11; figure - * [Y] 4,5; | [X]US3880159 (DIAMOND JULES B) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0039323 (ENDER HANS GEORG) |