EP0958496 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PARALLEL CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSINGER, Josef Friedrich Otto Schott Weg 3 D-31319 Sehnde / DE | 02 /
GUNDLACH, Frank Haltenhoffstrasse 189A D-30419 Hannover / DE | 03 /
SINNER, Ernst Baumgartenstrasse 16 D-30419 Hannover / DE | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Gosmann, Martin, et al Abbott Products GmbH IP Department (PH-ZP) Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Gosmann, Martin, et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 98905382.2 | 02.02.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998EP00535 | Priority number, date | DE1997104477 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704477 | [1999/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835227 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958496 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958496 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/46, B01D15/08 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
G01N30/467 (EP,US);
B01D15/1885 (EP,US);
G01N30/80 (EP,US);
G01N30/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLEL-CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [1999/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PARALLEL CHROMATOGRAPHY | [1999/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PARALLELE | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1095569 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) [A] 1,5* claims 1,3 *; | [A]DE1966363 (UNIV YESHIVA) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2268267 (SARTORIUS MEMBRANFILTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 25; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2545997 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3927863 (GYNKOTEK GES FUER DEN BAU WISS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 35-50; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0425297 (HELENA LAB CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |