EP0970547 - COAXIAL CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOZZER, Dieter Avenue de la Gare 47 CH-1880 Bex / CH | 02 /
KEMPTER, Sébastien Chemin Pré-d'Emoz 39 CH-1860 Aigle / CH | 03 /
RITHENER, Blaise Avenue de la Prairie 9bis CH-1800 Vevey / CH | 04 /
THOMAS, Lionel Rue du Village CH-1967 Bramois / CH | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 98905591.8 | 18.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998IB00381 | Priority number, date | GB19970006155 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9706155 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843323 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970547 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970547 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/02, H01R9/05, H01R12/16 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H01R13/2471 (EP);
H01R12/714 (EP);
H01R24/50 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | H01R17/12, H01R9/05, H01R23/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/02] | Title | German: | KOAXIALVERBINDER FÜR GEDRUCKTE SCHALTUNGEN | [2000/02] | English: | COAXIAL CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARD | [2000/02] | French: | CONNECTEUR AXIAL POUR CARTE A CIRCUITS IMPRIMES | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXY]WO9718603 (THE WHITAKER CORPORATION) [PX] 1-3,5-10 [Y] 4; | [YA]US5180315 (M. NAGASHIMA) [Y] 4 [A] 1-3,5-10; | [A]EP0722202 (THE WHITAKER CORPORATION) [A] 1-10; | [A]US5688130 (S.-S. HUANG) [A] 1-10; | [A]US5145382 (D.M. DICKIRSON) [A] 1-10; | [A]EP0647985 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY, LIMITED) [A] 1-10 |