EP0961657 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATION OF CARBON FROM FLYASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPARATION TECHNOLOGIES INC. Suite 303, 10 Kearney Road Needham, Massachusetts 02194 / US | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITTNER, James, D. 10 Kearney Road, Suite 303 Needham, MA 02194 / US | 02 /
DUNN, Thomas, M. 7 Alice Avenue Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | 03 /
HRACH, Frank, J., Jr. 19 Majac Way Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2000/11] |
Former [1999/49] | 01 /
BITTNER, James, D. 10 Newport Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | ||
02 /
DUNN, Thomas, M. 7 Alice Avenue Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | |||
03 /
HRACH, Frank, J., Jr. 19 Majac Way Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Hughes, Siân Victoria, et al Venner, Shipley & Co 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98906625.3 | 23.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US03420 | Priority number, date | US19970805157 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: US 805157 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836844 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961657 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961657 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B03C7/00, B03B9/00 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
B03B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
B03C7/006 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [1999/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUR TRENNUNG VON KOHLENSTOFF AUS FLUGASCHE | [1999/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATION OF CARBON FROM FLYASH | [1999/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SEPARER LE CARBONE PRESENT DANS DES CENDRES VOLANTES | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.07.2002 | GR | 24.07.2002 | LI | 24.07.2002 | DK | 24.10.2002 | PT | 24.10.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/31] | CH | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPS57171454 ; | [A]JPS5949858 ; | [YA]US4482351 (KITAZAWA KOHJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2,10-12,14,17; | [DA]US5513755 (HEAVILON JERRY L [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,13 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 15 - line 58; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830120), vol. 007, no. 014, Database accession no. (C - 146), & JP57171454 A 19821022 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1,13 * abstract * [A] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840627), vol. 008, no. 138, Database accession no. (C - 231), & JP59049858 A 19840322 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,13 * abstract * | [DA] - D.R.WHITLOCK, "Electrostatic separation of unburned carbon from fly ash", PROCEEDINGS TENTH INT.ASH USE SYMPOSIUM, (1993), vol. 2, pages 70-1 - 70-2, XP002063618 [DA] 22 * pages 70-1 * |