EP0964730 - AUTOMATIC DICE GAME MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAUT Naamloze Vennootschap Europark-Oost, 6 B-9100 Sint Niklaas / BE | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERSTRAETEN, Eric De Cauwerstraat 67 B-9100 Sint Niklaas / BE | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98906763.2 | 20.02.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998BE00024 | Priority number, date | BE19970000174 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: BE 9700174 | [1999/51] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841296 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964730 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964730 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/04, G07F17/34 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A63F9/0406 (EP,US);
A63F2009/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES WÜRFELSPIEL-GERÄT | [1999/51] | English: | AUTOMATIC DICE GAME MACHINE | [1999/51] | French: | MACHINE DE JEU DE DES AUTOMATIQUE | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1998 | Translation filed | 16.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2000 | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 20.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | FI | 20.03.2003 | DK | 30.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | LU | 20.02.2003 | |
FI | 20.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 20.03.2003 | |
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 20.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR822137 (KATZ) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3175826 (DAVIS GARLIN R) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB1180560 (MAYFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8402281 (DIGITAL PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0426301 (HARRY LEVY AMUSEMENT CONTRACTO [GB]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0615775 (MAYGAY MACHINES [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |