EP0932713 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE CONNECTION OF A JACQUARD HEDDLE WITH ITS CONTROL MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/31] | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE CONNECTION OF A JACQUARD HEDDLE WITH ITS CONTROL AND/OR RETURN MEANS | ||
[2001/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tardy, Jean-Jacques 28, Rue Antoine Roybet 69740 Genas / FR | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Perrier, Jean-Pierre Cabinet GERMAIN ET MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [1999/31] | Application number, filing date | 98906969.5 | 04.02.1998 | [1999/31] | WO1998FR00201 | Priority number, date | FR19970001518 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: FR 9701518 | [1999/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835080 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932713 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932713 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D03C3/40 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
D03C3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1999/31] | Title | German: | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERBINDUNG EINER JAQUARDLITZE MIT IHREN STEUERMITTELN | [2001/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE CONNECTION OF A JACQUARD HEDDLE WITH ITS CONTROL MEANS | [2001/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE LA LIAISON D'UNE LISSE JACQUARD AVEC SES MOYENS DE COMMANDE | [2001/09] |
Former [1999/31] | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERBINDUNG EINER JAQUARDLITZE MIT IHREN STEUER-UND/ODER RÜCKSTELLMITTELN | ||
Former [1999/31] | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE CONNECTION OF A JACQUARD HEDDLE WITH ITS CONTROL AND/OR RETURN MEANS | ||
Former [1999/31] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE LA LIAISON D'UNE LISSE JACQUARD AVEC SES MOYENS DE COMMANDE ET/OU DE RAPPEL | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2674264 (AMSTAR) [A] 1,3,4,6 * page 2, line 19 - line 28; figure - *; | [A]EP0292632 (CREAZIONI TESSILI BORSA DI CES) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 48 - line 53; figure 9 *; | [A]FR2212891 (TAINE YVON) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claims 5,6 *; | [A]FR2198011 (DUTEL MARCEL) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim 2 *; | [A]FR2114285 (DUTEL MARCEL;DUTEL ANDRE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 13 - line 16; figure - * |