EP0962002 - APPARATUS FOR DEACTIVATING MAGNETOMECHANICAL EAS MARKERS AFFIXED TO MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road, P.O. Box 31 07 00 Boca Raton, FL 33431-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPLAND, Richard, L. 5544 Lake Shore Village Circle Lake worth, FL 33463 / US | 02 /
COFFEY, Kevin, R. 2364 Foilage Oak Terrace Oviedo, FL 32766 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/11] | 01 /
COPELAND, Richard, L. 5544 Lake Shore Village Circle Lake worth, FL 33463 / US | ||
02 /
COFFEY, Kevin, R. 2364 Foilage Oak Terrace Oviedo, FL 32766 / US | |||
Former [1999/49] | 01 /
COPELAND, Richard, L. 20777 Ramita Trail Boca Raton, FL 33433 / US | ||
02 /
COFFEY, Kevin, R. 21360 Gosier Way Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Ostendstrasse 132 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907406.7 | 04.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US02475 | Priority number, date | US19970801489 | 18.02.1997 Original published format: US 801489 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838610 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962002 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962002 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B13/24 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G08B13/2411 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/49] | G08B13/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DEAKTIVIERUNG VON MAGNETOMECHANISCHEN AN MAGNETISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERN BEFESTIGTEN EAS-ETIKETTEN | [1999/49] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DEACTIVATING MAGNETOMECHANICAL EAS MARKERS AFFIXED TO MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM PRODUCTS | [1999/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE DESACTIVATION DE MARQUEURS MAGNETOMECANIQUES DE SURVEILLANCE ELECTRONIQUE D'ARTICLES APPLIQUES A DES SUPPORTS MAGNETIQUES D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2004/38] |
Former [1999/49] | APPAREIL DE DESACTIVATION DES MARQUAGES MAGNETOMECANIQUES D'UN SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE DE SURVEILLANCE D'ARTICLES APPLIQUES A DES SUPPORTS MAGNETIQUES D'ENREGISTREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.07.2005 | [2005/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4160978 (DUHAMEL RAYMOND H); | [Y]US4184163 (WOODWARD OAKLEY M [US]); | [A]US5225807 (ZHOU PETER Y [US], et al); | [Y]US5341125 (PLONSKY CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al); | [A]US5404147 (DRUCKER FRANK [US], et al); | [X]US5477202 (ZAREMBO PETER J [US], et al); | [A]US5499015 (WINKLER STEPHEN [US], et al) |