EP0977836 - LEAFY COTYLEDON1 GENES AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, John, J. 115 Grande Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | 02 /
LOTAN, Tamar 1733 A. Fulton Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 03 /
OHTO, Masa-aki 2-5-1, Tatsumi-minami 1-23 Okazaki 444 / JP | 04 /
GOLDBERG, Robert, B. 21907 Canon Drive Topanga, CA 90290 / US | 05 /
FISCHER, Robert, L. 1423 Scott Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/06] | 01 /
HARADA, John, J. 115 Grande Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | ||
02 /
LOTAN, Tamar 408 Russell Park 4 Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
03 /
OHTO, Masa-aki 2-5-1, Tatsumi-minami 1-23 Okazaki 444 / JP | |||
04 /
GOLDBERG, Robert, B. 21907 Canon Drive Topanga, CA 90290 / US | |||
05 /
FISCHER, Robert, L. 1423 Scott Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/06] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98907487.7 | 20.02.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998US02998 | Priority number, date | US19970804534 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 804534 | US19980026221 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: US 26221 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837184 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977836 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/82, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8222 (EP,US);
C12N15/8234 (EP,US);
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/06] | C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/29, C12N15/82, A01H1/00, A01H3/00, A01H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | GENE DES TYPUS LEAFY COTYLEDON 1 UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2008/33] | English: | LEAFY COTYLEDON1 GENES AND THEIR USES | [2000/06] | French: | GENES DE TYPE LEAFY COTYLEDON1 LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2008/33] |
Former [2000/06] | GENE DES TYPUS "LEAFY COTYLEDON 1" UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2000/06] | GENES DE TYPE "COTYLEDON1 FEUILLU" ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PAPAGIANNOPOULOS P ET AL, "The hapC gene of Aspergillus nidulans is involved in the expression of CCAAT-containing promoters", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (1996), vol. 251, no. 4, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 412 - 421, XP002101443 [X] 1,2,4,11 * the whole document * | [DA] - WEST MARILYN A L WEST ET AL, "LEAFY COTYLEDON1 is an essential regulator of late embryogenesis and cotyledon identity in Arabidopsis", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (199412), vol. 6, no. 12, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1731 - 1745, XP002136429 [DA] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.6.12.1731 | [DA] - MEINKE D W ET AL, "LEAFY COTYLEDON MUTANTS OF ARABIDOPSIS", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19940801), vol. 6, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1049 - 1064, XP002064532 [DA] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.6.8.1049 | International search | [Y] - MEINKE D. W., "A HOMOEOTIC MUTANT OF ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA WITH LEAFY COTYLEDONS.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19921204), vol. 258., doi:10.1126/science.258.5088.1647, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1647 - 1650., XP002910774 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.258.5088.1647 | [Y] - HECK G. R., ET AL., "AGL15, A MADS DOMAIN PROTEIN EXPRESSED IN DEVELOPING EMBRYOS.", The Plant Cell, American Society of Plant Biologists, US, US, (19950801), vol. 07., doi:10.1105/tpc.7.8.1271, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1271 - 1282., XP002910775 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.7.8.1271 | [Y] - VALVEKENS D., MONTAGU VAN M., LIJSEBETTENS VAN M., "AGROBACTERIUM TUMEFACIENS-MEDIATED TRANSFORMATION OF ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA ROOT EXPLANTS BY USING KANAMYCIN SELECTION.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19880801), vol. 85., doi:10.1073/pnas.85.15.5536, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5536 - 5540., XP002910776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.15.5536 | [Y] - CHAN M.-T., CHAO Y.-C., YU S.-M., "NOVEL GENE EXPRESSION SYSTEM FOR PLANT CELLS BASED ON INDUCTION ALPHA-AMYLASE PROMOTER BY CARBOHYDRATE STARVATION.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19940701), vol. 269., no. 26., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17635 - 17641., XP002910777 | [Y] - SHIMADA H., ET AL., "ANTISENSE REGULATION OF THE RICE WAXY GENE EXPRESSION USING A PCR- AMPLIFIED FRAGMENT OF THE RICE GENOME REDUCES THE AMYLOSE CONTENTÄ IN GRAIN STARCH.", THEORY OF APPLIED GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19930101), vol. 86., pages 665 - 672., XP002910778 |