EP0961804 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FUEL RESISTANT LIQUID POLYTHIOETHER POLYMERS WITH GOOD LOW TEMPERATURE FLEXIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRC-Desoto International, Inc. 2820 Empire Avenue Burbank, CA 91504 / US | [2000/07] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states COURTAULDS AEROSPACE, INC. 5430 San Fernando Road Glendale, CA 91209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOOK, Johnathan, Doherty 20303 High Point Place Santa Clarita, CA 91351 / US | 02 /
DeMOSS, Suzanna 17420 Vanowen street 5 Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | 03 /
JORDAN, David, Weldon 10960 Des Moines Avenue Northridge, CA 91326 / US | 04 /
RAO, Chandra, B. 25716 North Player Drive, T-15 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2000/01] |
Former [1999/49] | 01 /
ZOOK, Johnathan, Doherty 20303 High Point Place Santa Clarita, CA 91351 / US | ||
02 /
DeMOSS, Suzanna 3215 Overland Avenue 7166 Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | |||
03 /
JORDAN, David, Weldon 10960 Des Moines Avenue Northridge, CA 91326 / US | |||
04 /
RAO, Chandra, B. 25716 North Player Drive, T-15 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98907525.4 | 19.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US03223 | Priority number, date | US19970802130 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: US 802130 | US19970928972 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 928972 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9839365 | Date: | 11.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961804 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961804 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0961804 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/04, C08L81/02, C08L81/06 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C08G75/045 (EP);
C08G75/12 (US);
C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L61/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L81/02, C08L61/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/49] | C08G75/04, C08L81/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT [1999/49] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGER, TREIBSTOFFBESTÄNDIGER POLYMERE MIT HOHER BIEGSAMKEIT BEI TIEFER TEMPERATUR | [1999/49] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FUEL RESISTANT LIQUID POLYTHIOETHER POLYMERS WITH GOOD LOW TEMPERATURE FLEXIBILITY | [1999/49] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMERES DE POLYTHIOETHER LIQUIDES RESISTANT AU CARBURANT ET PRESENTANT UNE BONNE FLEXIBILITE A BASSE TEMPERATURE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2003 | BE | 18.06.2003 | FI | 18.06.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | IE | 19.02.2004 | LU | 19.02.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/19] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
IE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 18.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU484203B (PRODUCTS RESEARCH & CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] 24-36 * claim - *; | [X]EP0055531 (PROD RES & CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,37-47 * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 25; claim - *; | [A] - NUYKEN O, "TELECHELICS VIA ADDITION OF DITHIOLS ONTO ALKADIENES, 2A). ÖBASE AND ACID CATALYSIS", MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,CH,HUTHIG UND WEPF VERLAG, BASEL, (19901001), vol. 191, no. 10, ISSN 0025-116X, pages 2465 - 2473, XP000330153 [A] 24-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1990.021911024 | [A] - KLEMM E ET AL, "UNTERSUCHUNGEN ZUR THIOLADDITION AN POLYBUTADIENE", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH,WEINHEIM, (19930401), vol. 207, ISSN 0003-3146, pages 187 - 193, XP000369354 [A] 24-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1993.052070117 | [A] - GORSKI U ET AL, "PEROXID-INDUZIERTE THIOLADDITION AN POLYBUTADIEN", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH,WEINHEIM, (19950101), vol. 224, ISSN 0003-3146, pages 125 - 131, XP000482377 [A] 24-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1995.052240113 | International search | [Y]US4366307 (SINGH HAKAM, et al); | [Y]US5225472 (CAMERON RANDY [US], et al) |