EP0964645 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/51] | FABRIC PROSTHESIS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2007/33] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Tyco Group S.A.R.L. 2nd Floor, 6, avenue Emile Reuter 2420 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMICAN, Barry, L. 12 Hy-vue Drive Fairfield, CT 06470 / US | 02 /
HUTTON, Jeffrey, D. 41 Turrill Brook Drive Southbury, CT 06488 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907596.5 | 24.02.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998US03535 | Priority number, date | US19970039208P | 28.02.1997 Original published format: US 39208 P | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837813 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964645 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964645 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, D01F6/06, A61L31/04 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
D04B21/12 (EP);
A61L31/048 (EP);
D01F6/06 (EP);
A61F2/0063 (EP);
D10B2509/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/048, C08L23/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/51] | A61B17/00, D01F6/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [1999/51] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GEWEBE | [2007/17] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A FABRIC | [2007/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION POUR UN TISSU | [2007/17] |
Former [1999/51] | GEWEBE-PROTHESE UND HERSTELLUNGS VERFAHREN | ||
Former [1999/51] | FABRIC PROSTHESIS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | ||
Former [1999/51] | PROTHESE EN TISSU ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9702789 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4452245 (USHER FRANCIS C [US]) [DA] 1-30 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5292328 (HAIN MATTHEW E [US], et al) |