EP0952903 - SHAVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02119 / US | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSENG, Mingchih, M. 4 Partridge Drive Hingham, MA 02043 / US | 02 /
KWIECIAN, Michael, J. Apartment 3,30 Merrymount Avenue Quincy, MA 02170 / US | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907667.4 | 26.02.1998 | [1999/44] | WO1998US03877 | Priority number, date | US19970807492 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: US 807492 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9838015 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0952903 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952903 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/44 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B26B21/443 (EP,US);
B26B19/00 (KR);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q9/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/87 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/44] | B26B21/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/44] | Title | German: | RASIERSYSTEM | [1999/44] | English: | SHAVING SYSTEM | [1999/44] | French: | SYSTEME DE RASAGE | [1999/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2003
09.01.2004
WITHDRAWN Société BIC 14 Rue Jeanne d'Asnières F-92611 CLICHY CEDEX / FR Opponent's representative Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | 02
04.06.2003
26.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Schick Manufacturing, Inc. 10 Leighton Road Milford CT 06460-9001 / US Opponent's representative Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2003
09.01.2004
WITHDRAWN Société BIC 14 Rue Jeanne d'Asnières F-92611 CLICHY CEDEX / FR Opponent's representative Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
02
04.06.2003
26.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Schick Manufacturing, Inc. 10 Leighton Road Milford CT 06460-9001 / US Opponent's representative Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | |||
Former [2003/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2003
WITHDRAWN Société BIC 14 Rue Jeanne d'Asnières F-92611 CLICHY CEDEX / FR Opponent's representative Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
02
04.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Schick Manufacturing, Inc. 10 Leighton Road Milford CT 06460-9001 / US Opponent's representative Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | 18.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.12.2005 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.09.2002 | BE | 04.09.2002 | CH | 04.09.2002 | FI | 04.09.2002 | GR | 04.09.2002 | LI | 04.09.2002 | NL | 04.09.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.12.2002 | PT | 13.12.2002 | IE | 26.02.2003 | LU | 26.02.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
LU | 26.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
LU | 26.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 04.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4944090 (SUMNALL STANLEY [US]) [A] 1,32 * column W *; | [A]US5095619 (DAVIS IRIS J [US], et al); | [A]US5388331 (DOROODIAN-SHOJA SIAMAK [US]) [A] 1,32 * column W *; | [XA]WO9604112 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 32 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 14; figure 5; claims 1,9,11,12 * [A] 1 | by applicant | US4586225 | US5113585 | WO9737819 |