EP0970070 - PHTHALAZINES WITH ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2001/32] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLD, Guido Bleumatthöhe 16 CH-5073 Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | 02 /
FREI, Jörg Buechring 36 CH-4434 Hölstein / CH | 03 /
TRAXLER, Peter Bündtenring 3 CH-4124 Schönenbuch / CH | 04 /
ALTMANN, Karl-Heinz Tannenweg 5 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 05 /
METT, Helmut Freiburgerstrasse 21 D-79395 Neuenburg / DE | 06 /
STOVER, David, Raymond 11 Nelson Way Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | 07 /
WOOD, Jeanette Mühleweg 15 CH-4105 Biel-Benken / CH | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/02] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property Patent- und Markenabteilung 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98908086.6 | 11.02.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP00764 | Priority number, date | CH19970000315 | 13.02.1997 Original published format: CH 31597 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835958 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970070 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970070 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/50, C07D401/12, C07D403/06, C07D401/14, C07F5/02, C07D413/14, C07D405/14, C07D471/04 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Extension states | RO | 30.07.1999 | SI | 30.07.1999 | Title | German: | PHTHALAZINES MIT ANGIOGENESIS-HEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2000/02] | English: | PHTHALAZINES WITH ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITING ACTIVITY | [2000/02] | French: | PHTHALAZINES A ACTIVITE INHIBITRICE DE L'ANGIOGENESE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2006/14] | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE1061788 (CIBA GEIGY) [XD] 1,2,4,16 * column 1, lines 35-40 *; | [A]DE2021195 (ASPRO NICHOLAS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0600831 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0722936 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10,14,16 * see in particular formulae III and V (p.5/6) and example 12 , *; | [PA]WO9726258 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PA] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A] - UENISHI ET AL., "Preparation of 1-(3-pyridylmethyl)phthalazines as blood platelet aggregation inhibitors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911209), vol. 115, no. 23, Database accession no. 256197s, page 869, XP002066003 [A] 1-16 * abstract * |