EP0892899 - HUB FOR PRELIMINARY SHOCK ABSORBER IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE, AND TORQUE DAMPING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | [1999/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMERYCK, Bruno 2, rue de l'Argillière F-80160 Belleuse / FR | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle, B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 98908187.2 | 13.02.1998 | [1999/04] | WO1998FR00281 | Priority number, date | FR19970001857 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: FR 9701857 | [1999/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836188 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892899 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892899 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/123 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
F16F15/1207 (EP,US);
F16F15/1238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [1999/04] | Title | German: | NABE FÜR VORDÄMPFER,INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHZZEUG, UND TORSIONSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DERSELBEN | [1999/04] | English: | HUB FOR PRELIMINARY SHOCK ABSORBER IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE, AND TORQUE DAMPING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [1999/04] | French: | MOYEU POUR PREAMORTISSEUR NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR DE TORSION COMPORTANT UN TEL MOYEU | [1999/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0155785 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4586596 (SCHMID CHRISTOPH [US]); | [A]GB2190462 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | [A]DE19526051 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0546557 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]DE4430262 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [DA]FR2726341 (VALEO [FR]); | [DA]FR2693778 (VALEO [FR]) | by applicant | US5601173 |