EP0981282 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT AND NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/09] | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT | ||
[2004/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griffin Industries, Inc. 4221 Alexandria Pike Cold Spring, KY 41076-1897 / US | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFIN, Martin, W. 3264 High Ridge Drive Taylor Mill, KY 41015 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Steven, D. Route 1, Box 47 Falmouth, KY 41040 / US | 03 /
CROWLEY, John, L. 324 West Marie Drive Alexandria, KY 41001 / US | 04 /
WEDDINGTON, Eugene, M. 3394 West U.S. 22 & 3 Loveland, OH 45140 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98908547.7 | 12.02.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US02854 | Priority number, date | US19970038863P | 27.02.1997 Original published format: US 38863 P | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837773 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981282 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981282 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/04, A23J1/06, A23J1/10 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A23K10/14 (EP);
A23K10/24 (EP);
A23K10/26 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNGSMITTELS UND NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNGSMITTEL | [2004/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT AND NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT | [2004/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SUPPLEMENT NUTRITIONNEL ET SUPPLEMENT NUTRITIONNEL | [2004/12] |
Former [2000/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNGSMITTELS | ||
Former [2000/09] | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT | ||
Former [2000/09] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SUPPLEMENT NUTRITIONNEL | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 25.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/27] | ES | 26.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2167639 (BOSCOOP AGRARIPARI KOZOS VALLA) [Y] 1-16 * page 11, line 4 - line 14 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,9,13,24,27-29 *; | [Y]US5049397 (KOLBECK WINFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 5, line 26 - line 38 * * column 6, line 37 - line 41 *; | [Y]WO9118520 (ADVANCED HYDROLYZING SYST [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 9 * * page 5, line 13 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, line 11 - line 15 * * page 29, line 36 - page 30, line 4 * * claims 1,25-28 *; | [Y]US4089978 (LUGAY JOAQUIN CASTRO, et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US3272632 (PAUL SPEER) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 15 - line 26 * * claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US5049397 (KOLBECK WINFRIED [DE], et al); | [Y]US4089978 (LUGAY JOAQUIN CASTRO, et al); | [Y]US4269865 (RETRUM ROWLAND) |