EP0914067 - ULTRASONIC INTERLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [1999/38] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLOGG, Scott P.O. Box 17243 Esmond, RI 02917 / US | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98908572.5 | 19.02.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998US03052 | Priority number, date | US19970808638 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: US 808638 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837821 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914067 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914067 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/3476 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320088 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ULTRASCHALLINSTRUMENT | [1999/19] | English: | ULTRASONIC INTERLOCK | [1999/19] | French: | EMBOUT DE MONTAGE DE DISPOSITIF A ULTRASONS | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.09.2003 | [2004/33] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5026387 (THOMAS ALAN E [US]) [A] 1,8,20-23 * abstract *; | [A]US5397293 (ALLIGER HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1,8,20-23* abstract *; | [DA]US5449370 (VAITEKUNAS JEFFREY J [US]) [DA] 1,8,20-23 * abstract *; | [A]US5472447 (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [A] 1,8,20-23 * abstract * |