EP1027491 - PAPER STRUCTURES HAVING AT LEAST THREE REGIONS INCLUDING DECORATIVE INDICIA COMPRISING LOW BASIS WEIGHT REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAN, Dean, Van, Phan 6512 Tylers Crossing West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
TROKHAN, Paul, Dennis 1356 Warvel Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | 03 /
HOOPER, Jane, Ann 9722 Friartuck West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2000/33] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach/Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98908581.6 | 20.02.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US03104 | Priority number, date | US19970803696 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 803696 | US19970803695 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 803695 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837274 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027491 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027491 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP);
D21F11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | FASERSTRUKTUR MIT MINDESTENS DREI ZONEN, VERSEHEN MIT ZONEN NIEDRIGEM FLÄCHENGEWICHT ENTHALTENDEN DEKORATIVEN ZEICHEN | [2000/33] | English: | PAPER STRUCTURES HAVING AT LEAST THREE REGIONS INCLUDING DECORATIVE INDICIA COMPRISING LOW BASIS WEIGHT REGIONS | [2000/33] | French: | STRUCTURES DE PAPIER CONSTITUEES D'AU MOINS TROIS ZONES COMPORTANT UNE MARQUE DECORATIVE INCLUANT DES ZONES A FAIBLE POIDS DE BASE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2003 | BE | 21.05.2003 | CH | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | FR | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | NL | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | GB | 20.02.2004 | IE | 20.02.2004 | LU | 20.02.2004 | ES | 21.02.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/12] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
GB | 20.02.2004 | ||
IE | 20.02.2004 | ||
LU | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 21.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
GB | 20.02.2004 | ||
IE | 20.02.2004 | ||
LU | 20.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
GB | 20.02.2004 | ||
IE | 20.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
GB | 20.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9300475 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1,10 * the whole document *[A] 2-9 |