EP0964874 - A LYMPHOCYTE SURFACE RECEPTOR THAT BINDS CAML, NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THE SAME AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST. JUDE CHILDREN'S RESEARCH HOSPITAL 332 N. Lauderdale Avenue Memphis, TN 38105 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states ST. JUDE CHILDREN'S RESEARCH HOSPITAL 332 N. Lauderdale Avenue Memphis, TN 38105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAM, Richard, J. 857 Harbor Isle Circle, East Memphis, TN 38103 / US | 02 /
VON BULOW, Gotz 3908 14th Avenue NW Rochester MN 55901 / US | [2000/22] |
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
BRAM, Richard, J. 857 Harbor Isle Circle, East Memphis, TN 38103 / US | ||
02 /
VON BULOW, Gotz Apartment 47 1187 Natchez Point Memphis, TN 38103 / US | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/20] | Couchman, Jonathan Hugh, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | Allen, Philippa Margaret, et al Markgraaf Patents Limited The Crescent 54 Blossom Street York YO24 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98908948.7 | 03.03.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998US04270 | Priority number, date | US19970810572 | 03.03.1997 Original published format: US 810572 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839361 | Date: | 11.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964874 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964874 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N5/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C12N1/19, G01N33/68, A01K67/027 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | AN CAML BINDENDER LYMPHOZYTEOBERFLÄCHENREZEPTOR, NUKLEINSÄUREN DIE DAFÜR KODIEREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2006/46] | English: | A LYMPHOCYTE SURFACE RECEPTOR THAT BINDS CAML, NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THE SAME AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [1999/51] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE SURFACE DE LYMPHOCYTE LIANT UNE CYCLOPHILINE DE MODULATION DE SIGNAL DE CALCIUM (CAML), ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CODANT POUR CELLE-CI, ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [1999/51] |
Former [1999/51] | AN CAML BINDENDES OBERFLÄCHLICHEN-LYMPHOZYTHE-RECEPTOR, NUKLEINSÄUREN DIE DAFÜR KODIEREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRE VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.10.2006 | 06.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05020384.3 / EP1632500 | EP10179571.4 / EP2292654 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9535501 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-9 * see the whole document and specially example 2. *; | [D]US5523227 (BRAM RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]WO9618641 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [A] * page 7, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * * see example 3 (i) and (ii): pages 30-34. *; | [AD] - M.P. HOLLOWAY AND R.J. BRAM, "A hydrophobic domain of Ca2+-modulating cyclophilin ligand modulates calcium influx signalling in T lymphocytes", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BETHESDA, MA, US, (1996), vol. 271, no. 15, pages 8549 - 8552, XP002072291 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.15.8549 | [A] - K. TASHIRO ET AL.,, "Signal sequence trap: a cloning strategy for secreted proteins and type I membrane proteins", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON DC, US, (1993), vol. 261, pages 600 - 603, XP000673204 [A] 11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8342023 | [PX] - G-U. VON BULOW AND R.J. BRAM, "NF-AT activation induced by a CAML-interacting member of the tumor necrosis factor receptor superfamily", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19971003), vol. 278, no. 5335, pages 138 - 141, XP002072292 [PX] 1-10,12-22,26,29-37,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5335.138 | [PX] - G. U. VON BULOW AND R.J. BRAM, "Activation of the transcription factor NFAT by a novel CAML-interacting member of the tumor necrosis factor", BLOOD, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971115), vol. 90, no. 10 suppl. 1 part 1, pages 246A - 247, XP002072293 [PX] 1,5,7,9 * the whole document * | [PX] - DATABASE NUCLEOTIDE PROTEIN SEQUENCE, HINXTON, GB, XP002072294 [PX] 3 * AC= AC003958, Homo sapiens chromosome 17, clone hRPC.18_F_17. Whitehead Institute/MIT Center for Genome Research, Cambridge, US * |