EP0971957 - POLYPEPTIDE WITH APPETITE REGULATING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASTRUP, Sven Sankt Hansgade 1, 2.tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 02 /
CHRISTIANSEN, Kennet Gr nnemarksvej 4A DK-2610 R dovre / DK | 03 /
THIM, Lars Skiftevej 22 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | 04 /
JUDGE, Martin, Edward Borgergade 134,4.left DK-1300 Copenhagen K / DK | 05 /
KRISTENSEN, Peter Ved Bellah j 17B, 13 DK-2700 Br nsh j / DK | [2000/14] |
Former [2000/03] | 01 /
HASTRUP, Sven Sankt Hansgade 1, 2.tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
02 /
CHRISTIANSEN, Kennet Gr nnemarksvej 4A DK-2610 R dovre / DK | |||
03 /
THIM, Lars Skiftevej 22 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | |||
04 /
JUDGE, Martin, Edward Vendersgade 22, 4.tv. DK-1363 Copenhagen K / DK | |||
05 /
KRISTENSEN, Peter Ved Bellah j 17B, 13 DK-2700 Br nsh j / DK | Representative(s) | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard (DK) c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 98909375.2 | 26.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998DK00128 | Priority number, date | DK19970000358 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: DK 35897 | DK19970001315 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: DK 131597 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842747 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971957 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/48, A61K38/18, C07K14/595 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Extension states | AL | 26.10.1999 | LT | 26.10.1999 | LV | 26.10.1999 | MK | 26.10.1999 | RO | 26.10.1999 | SI | 26.10.1999 | Title | German: | POLYPEPTID MIT APPETIT REGULIERENDER AKTIVITÄT | [2000/03] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE WITH APPETITE REGULATING ACTIVITY | [2000/03] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE EXER ANT UNE ACTIVITE DE REGULATION DE L'APPETIT | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9634619 (AMGEN INC [US]) | [X] - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1996:173319, DOUGLASS JAMES et al., "Characterization of the Human cDNA and Genomic DNA Encoding CART: A Cocaine- and Amphetamine-Regulated Transcript"; & GENE, (1996), 169(2), 241-5. | [X] - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1995:451495, DOUGLASS JAMES et al., "PCR Differential Display Identifies a Rat Brain mRNA that is Transcriptionally Regulated by Cocaine and Amphetamine"; & J. NEUROSCI., (1995), 15(3, Pt. 2), 2471-81. |