EP0968190 - SUBSTITUTED ISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTICONVULSANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Mervyn, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
WARD, Robert William, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 03 /
EDWARDS, Peter David, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | West, Vivien, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | West, Vivien, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98909647.4 | 16.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998GB00782 | Priority number, date | GB19970005619 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9705619 | GB19970026695 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726695 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841508 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968190 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/04, A61K31/47, C07D217/02, C07D217/06, C07D409/12, C07D401/12, C07D417/12, C07D405/12, C07D413/12 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D217/22 (KR);
A61K31/472 (KR);
A61K31/4725 (KR);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D217/02 (EP);
C07D217/04 (EP);
C07D217/06 (EP);
C07D333/38 (KR);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Extension states | SI | 24.08.1999 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE ISOCHINOLINE DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTICONVULSIVA | [2000/01] | English: | SUBSTITUTED ISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTICONVULSANTS | [2000/01] | French: | DERIVES D'ISOQUINOLINE SUBSTITUEE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ANTICONVULSIVANTS | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Request for further processing for: | 06.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4022900 (MATHISON IAN WILLIAM) [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9748683 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,2,4-7* claim - *; | [X] - MATHISON I W ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND HYPOTENSIVE PROPERTIES OF TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1973), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 332 - 336, XP002040786 [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00262a005 |