EP0979120 - ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Medical Limited Partnership 2121 Herrick Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Jeffrey, D. 2219 Grandin Road Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98910446.8 | 17.03.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US05173 | Priority number, date | US19970819783 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: US 819783 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841273 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979120 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979120 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/04 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A61M16/04 (EP,US);
A61M16/0418 (EP,US);
A61M16/0429 (EP,US);
A61M16/0484 (EP,US);
A61M16/0488 (EP,US);
A61M16/0443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2000/07] | Title | German: | ENDOTRACHEALTUBUS | [2000/07] | English: | ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE | [2000/07] | French: | TUBE ENDOTRACHEAL | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 10.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.05.2005 | IT | 04.05.2005 | ES | 15.08.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2458305 (SANDERS RICHARD D) [X] 1,4,13,14,17 * column 2, line 28 - line 33; figures 1-4,6,8 * * column 3, line 13 - line 67 * * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 27 * [Y] 8,10,19; | [YA]US3964488 (RING WALLACE H, et al) [Y] 8,19 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 65; figures 1,6-9,14 * [A] 1,2,14,15; | [A]US4231365 (SCARBERRY EUGENE N) [A] 10,12 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 1; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4423725 (BARAN OSTAP E [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11,14,17 * column 4, line 8 - line 50; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 24 - line 27 * [Y] 12; | [XA]US5044369 (SAHOTA HARVINDER [US]) [X] 1,3,4,14,15,17 * column 4, line 28 - line 58; figures 3-6 * * column 5, line 1 - line 8; figure 7 * * column 6, line 13 - line 18; figures 13,14 * [A] 2,15; | [Y]US5414075 (SWAN DALE G [US], et al) [Y] 10,12 * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 29 * * column 8, line 51 - column 10, line 58 *; | [PX]US5720275 (PATIL VIJAYALAKSHMI [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,7,14,16,17 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-3 ** column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 40; figures 6-8 * |