EP0960229 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING A PATTERNING AGENT TO A LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Gladbacher Strasse 457 47805 Krefeld / DE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHRWEILER, Karl-Heinz Büdericher Strasse 87 D-47877 Willich / DE | 02 /
GRÜBER, Heinz Eichenstrasse 15 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 03 /
KELLER, Alfred Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 3 D-47877 Willich / DE | 04 /
SCHUMACHER, Walter Schwimming Strasse 39 D-53076 Aachen / DE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, et al Dres. Fitzner, Münch & Kluin Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Dres. Fitzner, Münch & Kluin Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | Palgen, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Palgen, Schumacher & Kluin, Mulvanystrasse 2 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98910581.2 | 04.02.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998DE00306 | Priority number, date | DE1997105258 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705258 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836121 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960229 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960229 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06B1/08, D06B11/00, F16K11/087 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
D06B11/0069 (EP,US);
D06B1/08 (EP,US);
F16K11/0876 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES BEMUSTERUNGSMITTELS AUF EINE BAHN | [1999/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR APPLYING A PATTERNING AGENT TO A LINE | [1999/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'APPLICATION D'UN AGENT POUR LA REALISATION D'UN MODELE SUR UNE BANDE CONTINUE | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2558260 (WALTER MAKY) [A] 3,5,6* column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 8 *; | [X]DE2900712 (MITTER MATHIAS) [X] 1,9,17 * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 8 * * page 12, line 1 - line 11 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 14 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 15 *; | [A]FR2539204 (FABRICATIONS INDLES [FR]) [A] 3,5,6,10 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 4 *; | [DA]DE3315770 (KUESTERS EDUARD [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 17 *; | [A]EP0193085 (ASEA GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,10 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 14 *; | [DA]DE9218012U (EDUARD KÜSTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO KG) [DA] 1,12 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 30 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 20 * |