EP0973709 - METHOD FOR CLEANING METHYL CHLORIDE CONTAMINATED WITH C1-C3 HYDROCARBONS AND/OR ISOBUTANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDNER, Kurt Hammerweg 28 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
WEBER, Rainer Forststrasse 15a D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
HAUSCHILD, Torsten Mühlenstrasse 48 D-51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
MÄCKER, Ralf Dechant-Krey-Strasse 22 D-51379 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
RUFFERT, Gerhard Höfer Weg 52 D-51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/36] |
Former [2000/04] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr. Böhm Rauch Krämer Leifert Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98910635.6 | 09.02.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP00701 | Priority number, date | DE19971006649 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706649 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837044 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973709 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973709 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/38, C07F7/16, C07C19/03 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07F7/16 (EP);
C07C17/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON MIT C1-C3-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN UND/ODER ISO-BUTAN VERUNREINIGTEM METHYLCHLORID | [2000/04] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING METHYL CHLORIDE CONTAMINATED WITH C1-C3 HYDROCARBONS AND/OR ISOBUTANE | [2000/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE CHLORURE DE METHYLE CONTAMINE PAR DES HYDROCARBURES C1-C3 ET/OU DE L'ISOBUTANE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.11.2002 | IT | 20.11.2002 | NL | 20.11.2002 | AT | 09.02.2003 | DK | 20.02.2003 | SE | 20.02.2003 | BE | 28.02.2003 | CH | 28.02.2003 | LI | 28.02.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
AT | 09.02.2003 | ||
DK | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
AT | 09.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 20.11.2002 | |
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 20.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1502557 ; | [A]CH253706 (LANDTMETERS JOSEPH CHARLES [BE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE3610706 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * claim - *; | [A]US5453113 (ZARCHY ANDREW S [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 64 - line 67; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 23, Database accession no. 90-177372, XP002068390 & SU1502557 A 00000000 (HETEROORG CPDS AS USSR) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |