EP0969811 - MIXTURES OF ALKYLPHOSPHORIC ACID ESTERS AND THEIR USE AS COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL EMULSIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUROWSKI-WANKE, Angelika Parkstrasse 40 D-65777 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
LÖFFLER, Matthias Hohe Kanzelstrasse 14 D-65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 03 /
EYRISCH, Oliver Söllingstrasse 99 D-45127 Essen / DE | 04 /
SKRYPZAK, Werner Jahnstrasse 10 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [2000/02] | Application number, filing date | 98910689.3 | 17.02.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP00890 | Priority number, date | DE1997107800 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707800 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837867 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969811 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969811 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/55 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/02] | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN VON ALKYLPHOSPHORSÄUREESTERN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS KOSMETISCHE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE EMULGATOREN | [2000/02] | English: | MIXTURES OF ALKYLPHOSPHORIC ACID ESTERS AND THEIR USE AS COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL EMULSIFIERS | [2000/02] | French: | MELANGES D'ESTERS D'ACIDE PHOSPHORIQUE D'ALKYLE ET LEURS UTILISATION COMME EMULSIFIANTS COSMETIQUES ET PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0442701 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * example - *; | [DA]GB2139112 (KAO CORP) [DA] 1-10 * example - *; | [A]EP0347844 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * example - *; | [A]DE2744980 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]US4101457 (PLACE GEOFFREY, et al) [A] 1 * column 15, line 59 - column 16, line 2; example - *; | [A]US4247424 (KUZEL MARYANN, et al) [A] 1 * column 8, paragraph 4 * |