EP0995466 - SIMULATOR PRECISION DEVICE APPLIED TO CYCLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | 07.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alvarez Fernandez, Manuel Avda. Castrelos, 54 Ent 36210 Vigo / ES | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/17] | Application number, filing date | 98910748.7 | 31.03.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998ES00081 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949942 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995466 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/052, A63B69/16 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A63B69/16 (EP,US);
A63B24/00 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A63B21/28 (EP);
A63B22/0023 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/17] | A63B69/16, G09B9/052 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | PRÄZISIONSSIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS FAHRRADFAHREN | [2000/17] | English: | SIMULATOR PRECISION DEVICE APPLIED TO CYCLING | [2000/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF SIMULATEUR DE PRECISION CON U POUR LE CYCLISME | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2000 | Translation filed | 28.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/17] | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2000 | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3302305 ; | [A]US4358105 (SWEENEY JR JAMES S); | [A]US4709917 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]); | [A]WO9010474 (SCHWINN BICYCLE CO [US]); | [A]EP0403295 (PROPEL PARTNERSHIP 1987 [IL]); | [A]WO9216267 (ATARI GAMES CORP [US]); | [E]ES2114440 (ALVAREZ FERNANDEZ MANUEL [ES]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1983-759780, & DE3302305 A 19830908 (KRIEGER) |