EP0913053 - SYNCHRONIZATION OF MULTIPLE VIDEO AND GRAPHIC SOURCES WITH A DISPLAY USING A SLOW PLL APPROACH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/24] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, John, D. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SHEN, Richard, C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CAVALLERANO, Alan, P. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98910930.1 | 09.04.1998 | [1999/18] | WO1998IB00543 | Priority number, date | US19970843807 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: US 843807 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9848570 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913053 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913053 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/073 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/073 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N5/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/18] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISIERUNG MEHRERER VIDEO- UND GRAPHIKQUELLEN MIT EINEM LANGSAM VARIIERENDEN PLL VERFAHREN | [1999/18] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION OF MULTIPLE VIDEO AND GRAPHIC SOURCES WITH A DISPLAY USING A SLOW PLL APPROACH | [1999/18] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION D'UN AFFICHEUR ET DE MULTIPLES SOURCES VIDEO ET GRAPHIQUES AU MOYEN D'UNE APPROCHE PLL A VARIATION LENTE | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2010 | 04.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5155595 (ROBISON JEREL D [US]); | [A]US5473385 (LESKE LAWRENCE A [US]); | [A]EP0710016 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | by applicant | US5155595 | EP0551168 |