EP0952532 - DOCUMENT PREPARATION METHOD AND MACHINE TRANSLATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODEN, Naoyuki, Sanyo Elect. Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
YUMURA, Takeshi, Sanyo Electr. Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
OHI, Kouzou, Sanyo Electr. Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98911156.2 | 30.03.1998 | [1999/43] | WO1998JP01502 | Priority number, date | JP19970080533 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8053397 | [1999/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844433 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952532 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
G06F40/137 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F40/117 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/151 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/43] | Title | German: | DOKUMENTHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND MACHINELLES ÜBERSETZUNGSGERÄT | [1999/43] | English: | DOCUMENT PREPARATION METHOD AND MACHINE TRANSLATION DEVICE | [1999/43] | French: | METHODE D'ELABORATION DE DOCUMENT ET APPAREILLAGE POUR TRADUCTION MACHINE | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1999 | Translation filed | 04.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 08.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02228766 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04299768 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0535782 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05120335 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0981569 (HITACHI LTD); | [AP]JPH09114836 (BROTHER IND LTD) |