EP1023012 - A METHOD FOR CREATING A SLEEVE MEMBER ATTACHED TO A BODY PORTION AND A SLEEVE MEMBER ACCORDING TO THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRI AB Datavägen 6 175 43 Järfälla / SE | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLBERG, Kennet Mörbylundsvägen 40 S-186 33 Vallentuna / SE | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 98911350.1 | 25.03.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998SE00543 | Priority number, date | SE19970001619 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: SE 9701619 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848741 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023012 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023012 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/80 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B29C67/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2/5046 (EP,US);
A61F2/80 (EP,US);
B29C70/72 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30065 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3009 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3021 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30217 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5053 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0091 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, IT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AN EINEM KÖRPERTEIL BEFESTIGTEN HÜLSE UNDDURCH DIESES VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE HÜLSE | [2000/31] | English: | A METHOD FOR CREATING A SLEEVE MEMBER ATTACHED TO A BODY PORTION AND A SLEEVE MEMBER ACCORDING TO THE METHOD | [2000/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN MANCHON ATTACHE A UNE PARTIE CORPORELLE ET MANCHON REALISE SELON CE PROCEDE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 01.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.10.2003 | IT | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/41] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9703819 (LAGHI ALDO A [US]); | [Y]US4473421 (GUSTAFSSON BENGT [SE]); | [Y]US4696780 (HAEGGLUND LARS [SE]); | [A]SE434928 (BOCK OTTO SCANDINAVIA AB [SE]) | Examination | US5603122 |