EP0998278 - HYDROXY AND ETHER-CONTAINING OXYALKYLENE ESTERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAR-ILAN UNIVERSITY 52900 Ramat Gan / IL | For all designated states MOR RESEARCH APPLICATIONS LTD. 11 Ben Gurion Street 51905 Givat Shmuel / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states BAR-ILAN UNIVERSITY IL-52900 Ramat Gan / IL | ||
For all designated states MOR RESEARCH APPLICATIONS LTD. 11 Ben Gurion Street 51905 Givat Shmuel / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUDELMAN, Abraham Miller 15 Street 76284 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
REPHAELI, Adi Hanuriotio 46726 Herzelia Pitoach / IL | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911574.6 | 11.03.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US04764 | Priority number, date | US19970814224 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: US 814224 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840065 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998278 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/22, A61K31/235, C07C69/02, C07C69/612, C07C69/708 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C07C69/708 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07C69/96 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | A61K31/22, A61K31/235, C07C69/02, C07C69/612 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Extension states | AL | 08.10.1999 | LT | 08.10.1999 | LV | 08.10.1999 | MK | 08.10.1999 | RO | 08.10.1999 | SI | 08.10.1999 | Title | German: | HYDROXY- UND ETHER-ENTHALTENDE OXYALKYLENESTER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2000/20] | English: | HYDROXY AND ETHER-CONTAINING OXYALKYLENE ESTERS AND USES THEREOF | [2000/19] | French: | ESTERS D'OXYALKYLENE HYDROXY ET RENFERMANT UN ETHER, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/19] | HYDROXY UND ÄTHER-ENTHALTENDE OXYALKYLENESTER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3700722 (MCTEER LUCIAN W); | [A]US4479963 (GRUENFELD NORBERT [US]); | [A]US4927966 (KALMAN THOMAS I [US]); | [A]US5030654 (BARNISH IAN T [GB], et al); | [A]US5412137 (PRASHAD MAHAVIR [US], et al) |