EP0968626 - CONDENSATION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR HEATED INSULATING GLASS UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBBEY-OWENS-FORD CO. 811 Madison Avenue Toledo Ohio 43697-0799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states LIBBEY-OWENS-FORD CO. 811 Madison Avenue Toledo, Ohio 43697-0799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLETT, Fred, A. 1248 Sandy Glen Drive Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 02 /
TEDER, Rein, S. 9401 Xylon Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | 03 /
GERHARDINGER, Peter, F. 1727 Glendel Lane Toledo, OH 43614 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98911749.4 | 18.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998US05252 | Priority number, date | US19970820784 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: US 820784 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842163 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968626 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/06, H05B3/26, H05B3/28, H01B3/06, H01B3/16, B23B3/10 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H05B3/84 (EP,US);
H05B3/06 (KR);
F25D21/02 (EP,US);
H05B1/0236 (EP,US);
H05B2203/035 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | H05B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | KONDENSATIONS-ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM VON BEHEIZTEN ISOLIERVERGLASUNGEN | [2000/01] | English: | CONDENSATION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR HEATED INSULATING GLASS UNITS | [2000/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGLAGE DE CONDENSATION POUR BLOCS-FENETRES A VITRAGE ISOLANT CHAUFFES | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 27.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/27] | 15.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5089687 (BARTRUG BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11,21 * column 1, lines 7-68 * * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-6; claims 1-17 * [A] 2-7,9,10,12-20,22; | [XA]EP0322757 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1,8,11,21 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-3; claims 1-10 * [A] 2-7,9,10,12-20,22; | [A]US5213878 (MOH KYUNG H [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * Whole document * | International search | [X]US5354966 (SPERBECK SCOTT W [US]); | [Y]US5099104 (HOLZER GERHARD [DE], et al); | [Y]US4737629 (IWAMA SHINJI [JP], et al) |