EP0983645 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION OF A TRANSMISSION RATE IN A CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCKERT, Eugene, J. 203 W. Noyes Arlington Heights, IL 60006 / US | 02 /
SEXTON, Thomas, A. 8409 Wind Cave Court Fort Worth, TX 76137 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911764.3 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US05289 | Priority number, date | US19970846767 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 846767 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849790 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983645 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983645 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/216, H04J13/00, H04L1/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
H04J3/0605 (EP,US);
H04B7/216 (KR);
H04B7/264 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | H04B7/216, H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, IT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINER ÜBERTRAGUNGSRATE IN EINEM CDMA KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2000/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION OF A TRANSMISSION RATE IN A CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EMISSION ET DE RECEPTION D'UN DEBIT DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AMDC | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2008 | Decision despatched | 12.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5465269 (SCHAFFNER T MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 40 - line 67 * * column 3, line 35 - line 39 * * column 4, line 22 - line 60 * * column 6, line 9 - line 29 * * column 6, line 57 - line 59 *; | [X]WO9636132 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1 * page 11, line 2 - page 13, line 25; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO9709810 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 5; figure 2 *; | [A] - COHEN E ET AL, "MULTI-RATE DETECTION FOR THE IS-95A CDMA FORWARD TRAFFIC CHANNELS USING THE 13KBPS SPEECH CODER", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC). CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS. DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960623), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-3251-2, pages 1844 - 1848, XP000625125 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5566206 (BUTLER BRIAN K [US], et al); | [AE]US5757850 (TAKAKI TETSUYA [JP]) |