EP0970333 - ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-ACTIVATED SORPTION REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFISTER, Dennis, M. 159 Orange Drive San Luis Obispo, CA 93405-1914 / US | 02 /
BYRD, Charles, M. 328 North Market #242 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/02] | 01 /
PFISTER, Dennis, M. 1301 Dogwood Trail Conway, AR 72032 / US | ||
02 /
BYRD, Charles, M. 400 Valencia 1222 Maumelle, AR 72113 / US | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Haines, Miles John D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911865.8 | 20.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998US05466 | Priority number, date | US19970821257 | 20.03.1997 Original published format: US 821257 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841801 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970333 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970333 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F25B35/04, F25B49/04, H05B6/80 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
F25B49/046 (EP,US);
F25B17/08 (EP,US);
F25B35/04 (EP,US);
F25B39/026 (EP,US);
F25D23/12 (EP,US);
H05B6/701 (EP,US);
H05B6/802 (EP,US);
H05B6/808 (EP,US);
H05K7/20363 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | SORPTIONSKÄLTEMASCHINE AKTIVIERT DURCH ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE WELLEN | [2000/02] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-ACTIVATED SORPTION REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2000/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFRIGERATION PAR SORPTION ACTIVE PAR ONDES ELECTROMAGNETIQUES | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 21.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00126616.2 / EP1085278 | EP00126617.0 / EP1085279 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5333471 (YAMADA YASUO [JP]) [X] 3 * column 4, line 45 - column 15, line 8; figure 14 * [A] 1,9,11,12; | [A]US4976117 (CROZAT GEORGES [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,9,11,12 * column 6, line 1 - column 14, line 27; figures 3-16 *; | [A]EP0091382 (BONNET ETS [FR]) [A] 1,3,9,11,12 * page 4, line 33 - page 10, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1877536 (RUCKELSHAUS JOHN G, et al) [A] 1,3,9,11,12 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 92; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2666141 (BOURGOGNE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [A] 2 * page 6, line 8 - page 9, line 17; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5222543 (CARLSTROM BENGT I [AT], et al) [A] 2 * column 3, line 12 - column 8, line 41; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2651621 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [A] 5,10 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5021620 (INUMADA MASATO [JP]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-3 *; | [DPA]WO9711323 (FMC CORP [US]) [DPA] 1-3,9,11,12 * page 4, line 6 - page 10, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4312641 (VERRANDO MARCEL G, et al) | by applicant | WO9711323 | US5216327 |