EP0970256 - HOT-ROLLING STEEL STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2002/17] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Thyssen Krupp Stahl AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRCHER, Hans Elsenborner Weg 39 D-45481 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
ESPENHAHN, Manfred Ostpreussenstrasse 65 D-45259 Essen / DE | 03 /
KAWALLA, Rudolf Ottenschlag 56 D-46422 Bottrop / DE | 04 /
WOLPERT, Waldemar Heisterbusch 79 D-46539 Dinslaken / DE | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Simons, Johannes, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Simons, Johannes, et al Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8 A 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | Simons, Johannes Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8 A 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912456.5 | 07.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP01338 | Priority number, date | DE19971012616 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712616 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842881 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970256 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970256 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, // B21B1/46 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
B21B1/26 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0231 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (KR);
C21D8/0273 (KR);
C21D9/54 (KR);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/02 (KR);
C22C38/04 (KR);
B21B1/46 (EP,US);
B21B2201/02 (EP,US);
B21B2201/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | WARMWALZEN VON STAHLBAND | [2000/02] | English: | HOT-ROLLING STEEL STRIP | [2000/02] | French: | LAMINAGE A CHAUD DE FEUILLARD D'ACIER | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Corus Staal BV PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL Opponent's representative Kruit, Jan Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Corus Staal BV PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL Opponent's representative Kruit, J., Ir. Corus Technology BV Corus Intellectual Property Department PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | 18.12.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.02.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2002 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2002 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.11.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/17] | 10.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 07.02.2001 | MC | 07.04.2001 | DK | 07.05.2001 | PT | 07.05.2001 | CH | 31.03.2002 | LI | 31.03.2002 | [2018/10] |
Former [2006/39] | IE | 07.02.2001 | |
MC | 07.04.2001 | ||
DK | 07.05.2001 | ||
PT | 07.05.2001 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | IE | 07.02.2001 | |
DK | 07.05.2001 | ||
PT | 07.05.2001 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | IE | 07.02.2001 | |
PT | 07.05.2001 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | IE | 07.02.2001 | |
PT | 07.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | IE | 07.02.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]BE807881R (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) [Y] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0067374 (FLORIN STAHL WALZWERK [DD]); | [A]DE3437637 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]); | [DY]EP0306076 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]) [DY] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19520832 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [AP]DE19600990 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) |