EP0994259 - CIRCUMFERENTIAL FLOW TYPE LIQUID PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA, Hiroshi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912793.1 | 14.04.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998JP01699 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953203 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994259 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04D5/00, F04D29/44 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
F04D5/002 (EP,US);
F04D9/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/16] | Title | German: | SEITENSTRÖMUNGSPUMPE | [2000/16] | English: | CIRCUMFERENTIAL FLOW TYPE LIQUID PUMP | [2000/16] | French: | POMPE A LIQUIDES DE TYPE A ECOULEMENT PERIPHERIQUE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2000 | Translation filed | 12.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 28.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06173881 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS63223388 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPS63160387U ; | [Y]JPH0519556U ; | [Y]JPS63164592U | by applicant | JPH073239 |