EP1008096 - AN AUTOMATED DOCUMENT PROCESSING SYSTEM USING FULL IMAGE SCANNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins-Allison Corp. 891, Feehanville Drive Mount Prospect, IL 60056 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION 891, Feehanville Drive Mount Prospect, IL 60056 / US | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION 891, Freehanville Drive Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION 891, Feehanville Drive Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, John, E. 43 Long Meadow Winnetka, IL 60043 / US | 02 /
JONES, William, J. 280 Poteet Barrington, IL 60010 / US | 03 /
MENNIE, Douglas, U. 229 Wood Street Barrington, IL 60010 / US | 04 /
JONES, Paul, A. 1618 Meadow Lane Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98912915.0 | 11.03.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US04664 | Priority number, date | US19970814978 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: US 814978 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9840839 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008096 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008096 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G07D7/12 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06Q20/0425 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/18 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
G06V30/127 (EP,US);
G06V30/274 (EP,US);
G07D11/50 (EP,US);
G07D7/04 (EP,US);
G07D7/06 (EP,US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
G07D7/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/202 (EP,US);
G07F19/207 (EP,US);
G07F7/04 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES DOKUMENTENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT VOLLBILDABTASTUNG | [2000/24] | English: | AN AUTOMATED DOCUMENT PROCESSING SYSTEM USING FULL IMAGE SCANNING | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOMATISE DE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS A LECTURE OPTIQUE PLEIN CADRE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2007 | 15.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07025211.9 / EP1903513 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2008
06.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 02
30.09.2008
09.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Talaris Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gicquel, Olivier Yves Gérard Rouse Patents 1st Floor 228-240 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7BY / GB | 03
02.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81688 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2008
06.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
30.09.2008
09.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Talaris Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gicquel, Olivier Yves Gérard Rouse Patents 1st Floor 228-240 Banbury Road GB-Oxford OX2 7BY / GB | |||
03
02.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
30.09.2008
Talaris Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | 10.11.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.02.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/18] | Appeal following opposition | 29.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0189/10 | 24.02.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2008 | FR | 24.10.2008 | DE | 01.10.2009 | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/05] | IT | 02.01.2008 | |
FR | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FR | 24.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2539898 (PROD INDLS STE EUROP [FR]) [A] 24-26,37* figure 4; claim - * | International search | [Y]US5135115 (MILLER JOHN P [US], et al); | [X]US5371798 (MCWHORTOR WILLIAM F [US]); | [A]US5467405 (RATERMAN DONALD E [US], et al); | [X]US5467406 (GRAVES BRADFORD T [US], et al); | [X]US5537486 (STRATIGOS WILLIAM N [US], et al); | [Y]US5592377 (LIPKIN EDWARD B [US]) | Examination | WO9610800 | by applicant | US4205780 | US4841358 | US5023782 | US5187750 | US5237158 | US5295196 | US5335292 | US5467406 |