EP0974076 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AND OPTICAL ELEMENT THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverside Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Chengzeng 51 Mapledale Avenue Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | 02 /
WU, Chengjiu 4 Treetop Terrace Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
STENGEL, Kelly, M., T. 905 Waterbury Road Thomaston, CT 06787 / US | 04 /
SHACKLETTE, Lawrence, W. 11 Alden Place Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | 05 /
ELDADA, Louay 38 Piersons Hill Road Randolph New jersey 07869 / US | 06 /
YARDLEY, James, T. 40 Macculloch Avenue Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2001/50] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
XU, Chengzeng 51 Mapledale Avenue Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | ||
02 /
WU, Chengjiu 4 Treetop Terrace Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
03 /
STENGEL, Kelly, M., T. 29 Boyden Parkway South Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | |||
04 /
SHACKLETTE, Lawrence, W. 11 Alden Place Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | |||
05 /
ELDADA, Louay 38 Piersons Hill Road Randolph New jersey 07869 / US | |||
06 /
YARDLEY, James, T. 40 Macculloch Avenue Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
Former [2000/04] | 01 /
XU, Chengzeng 51 Mapledale Avenue Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | ||
02 /
WU, Chengjiu 4 Treetop Terrace Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
03 /
STENGEL, Kelly, M., T. 29 Boyden Parkway South Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | |||
04 /
SHACKLETTE, Lawrence, W. 11 Alden Place Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | |||
05 /
ELDADA, Louay 20 Lakeside Drive Rockaway, NJ 07866 / US | |||
06 /
YARDLEY, James, T. 40 Macculloch Avenue Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913034.9 | 23.03.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US05609 | Priority number, date | US19970838344 | 08.04.1997 Original published format: US 838344 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845759 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974076 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974076 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G02B6/12 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
G03F7/001 (EP,US);
G03F7/7015 (KR);
G02B6/1221 (EP,US);
G03F7/70191 (KR);
G03F7/70225 (KR);
G03F7/70308 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTS UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT DARAUS | [2000/04] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AND OPTICAL ELEMENT THEREFROM | [2000/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ELEMENT OPTIQUE ET ELEMENT OPTIQUE AINSI OBTENU | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2003 | IT | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02273703 ; | [A]JPS62209401 ; | [A]JPH03241302 ; | [A]JPH06214274 ; | [DA]US4609252 (WONG SHI-YIN [US], et al); | [A]US4828359 (UEBA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al); | [A]US5046800 (BLYLER JR LEE L [US], et al) [A] 2,7,11 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]US5104771 (MURRAY ROBERT T [GB], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US5136682 (MOYER WENDELL W [US], et al); | [A]US5483612 (GALLAGHER DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 15; claims 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 51, Database accession no. 90-379491, XP002070947 & JPH02273703 A 00000000 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 42, Database accession no. 87-296585, XP002070948 & JPS62209401 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 49, Database accession no. 91-358661, XP002070949 & JPH03241302 A 00000000 (NOK CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 36, Database accession no. 94-288170, XP002070950 & JPH06214274 A 00000000 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP) [A] * abstract * |